Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] |
29.03.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] |
29.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.06.1994 | First examination report | |
07.05.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] |
25.02.1993 | Publication of search report | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] |
13.03.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] |