Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5507998 | 16.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28942090 | 26.10.1990 | US29439494 | 23.08.1994 | US78035191 | 22.10.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0482652 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1996 | B1 | EP0482652 | 14.04.1993 | A3 | EP0482652 | 29.04.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP28942090 | 26.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69119535T | 28.11.1996 | T2 | DE69119535D1 | 20.06.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP28942090 | 26.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0694158B | 24.11.1994 | B2 | JPH04163106 | 08.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28942090 | 26.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5342663 | 30.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP28942090 | 26.10.1990 |