EP0482652 - Preform for making plastic can body and method of manufacturing plastic can body by using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO., LTD. 4586-3, Koh, Komoro-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokobayashi, Kazuyuki Oaza-Suwagata 3050 Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Weber, Otto-Ernst, et al Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys., et al Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118182.4 | 24.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900289420 | 26.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28942090 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0482652 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0482652 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482652 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/00, B29C49/06, B29C49/12 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
B29C49/061 (EP,US);
B29C45/26 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0722 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0724 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0725 (EP,US);
B29C2949/073 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0731 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0733 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0762 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0769 (EP,US);
B29C2949/077 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0771 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0772 (EP,US);
B29C2949/078 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0816 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0817 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0818 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0829 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0838 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C49/12 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/253 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/18] | Title | German: | Vorformling zum Herstellen einer Kunststoffdose und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Dose aus diesem Vorformling | [1992/18] | English: | Preform for making plastic can body and method of manufacturing plastic can body by using the same | [1992/18] | French: | Préforme pour la production de boîtes en matière plastique et procédé pour la fabrication de boîtes à partir d'une telle préforme | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1108895 (HEINRICH BENZING FA); | [X]WO8301766 (CONTINENTAL GROUP [US]); | [AD]EP0140719 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0228324 (NISSEI ASB MACHINE CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JPS58501991 | JPS6025734 | JPS6072720 | - Metal Containers for Food Canning, and Double Seaming, JAPAN CANNED FOOD ASSOCIATION, INC., page 41 |