Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
10.06.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] |
13.09.1993 | First examination report | |
28.07.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
20.03.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |