Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0483684 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1994 | B1 | EP0483684 | 06.05.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP29836190 | 02.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69103122T | 03.11.1994 | T2 | DE69103122D1 | 01.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP29836190 | 02.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2779263B | 23.07.1998 | B2 | JPH04173519 | 22.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29836190 | 02.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5203260 | 20.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP29836190 | 02.11.1990 |