EP0483684 - Apparatus for binding articles with a rubber band having a mushroom-shaped hook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Michio 3-9-103, Koshien 5bancho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Kagei, Hiroshi 327, Onakashinden Kuwana-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118239.2 | 25.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900298361 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: JP 29836190 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483684 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483684 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/02 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B65B13/022 (EP,US);
Y10T24/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1992/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Binden von Objekten mit einem Band aus Gummi mit pilzförmigem Haken | [1992/19] | English: | Apparatus for binding articles with a rubber band having a mushroom-shaped hook | [1992/19] | French: | Appareil de liage d'objets avec une bande en caoutchouc muni d'un crochet en forme de champignon | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4335490 (TEACHOUT DONALD O); | [A]US4188871 (TEACHOUT DONALD O [US]); | [A]DE3619089 (PASSING HERMANN [DE]) |