EP0484777 - Method of stabilizing a combustion process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capek, Karel, Dipl.-Ing. Albert-Dimmers-Strasse 29 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Kirchmann, Holger, Dr. Unterbüscherhof 32 W-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Schweitzer, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Am Köttersbach 4 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Vaulont, Winfried, Dr. René-Bohn-Strasse 22 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1995/29] |
Former [1992/20] | 01 /
Capek, Karel, Dipl.-Ing. Albert-Dimmers-Strasse 29 W-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | ||
02 /
Kirchmann, Holger, Dr. Unterbüscherhof 32 W-5653 Leichlingen / DE | |||
03 /
Schweiter, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Am Köttersbach 4 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | |||
04 /
Vaulont, Winfried, Dr. René-Bohn-Strasse 22 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118317.6 | 28.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | DE19904035604 | 09.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4035604 | [1992/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484777 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484777 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484777 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/00, F23G7/06, F23D17/00, F23D14/66, F23L7/00 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
F23L7/00 (EP,US);
F23D14/66 (EP,US);
F23D17/00 (EP,US);
F23G7/008 (EP,US);
F23G7/065 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stabilisierung eines Verbrennungsvorganges | [1992/20] | English: | Method of stabilizing a combustion process | [1992/20] | French: | Procédé pour la stabilisation d'un processus de combustion | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 24.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3004186 (NITTETSU KAKOKI KK); | [Y]US4338870 (LANIER JR JOHN H); | [X]DE3446788 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]); | [Y]DE3828248 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) |