blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0490072

EP0490072 - Shotgun, particularly a double barrelled gun for trap-or skeetshooting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/25]Method for reducing the muzzle sound in firearms and firearms having a reduced muzzle sound
[1996/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.1997
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.01.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.1997 [1997/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heckler & Koch GmbH
Postfach 1329
D-78722 Oberndorf / DE
[1992/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Schumacher, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Ob der Sulzhalde 18
W-7238 Oberndorf a.N. / DE
[1992/25]
Representative(s)Turi, Michael, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1992/25]Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys.
SAMSON & PARTNER, Widenmayerstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date91118362.228.10.1991
[1992/25]
Priority number, dateDE1990403914107.12.1990         Original published format: DE 4039141
[1992/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0490072
Date:17.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0490072
Date:17.03.1993
Language:DE
[1993/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0490072
Date:21.02.1996
[1996/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.1993
ClassificationIPC:F41A21/28
[1992/25]
CPC:
F41A21/30 (EP,US); F41A21/28 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/25]
TitleGerman:Schrotflinte, insbesondere eine Doppellaufflinte zum Trap- oder Skeetschiessen[1996/08]
English:Shotgun, particularly a double barrelled gun for trap-or skeetshooting[1996/08]
French:Fusil de chasse, en particulier à double canon pour le tir au pigeon[1996/08]
Former [1992/25]Verfahren zur Reduzierung des Mündungsknalles von Feuerwaffen und Feuerwaffe mit reduziertem Mündungsknall
Former [1992/25]Method for reducing the muzzle sound in firearms and firearms having a reduced muzzle sound
Former [1992/25]Procédé pour réduire le son de la détonation de bouche des armes à feu et armes à feu ayant un son de détonation réduit
Examination procedure30.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/21]
07.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.08.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1995Fee for grant paid
22.11.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199404   M06   Fee paid on   18.11.1994
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE264618  ;
 [A]CH10365  (TITTMANN FRANZ DR [AT]);
 [X]FR420371  (CONSTANT FRANCOIS MARIE GALAIN [FR]);
 [Y]US1331474  (MASTER SHAVERKSHA D);
 [Y]CH203462  (BRUN JOSEF [CH], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.