EP0483741 - SQUID utilizing polymeric insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOMAGNETIC TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 9727 Pacific Heights Blvd. San Diego, CA 92121-3719 / US | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsden, James R. 11429 Nawa Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Dreiss, Uwe DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Dreiss, Uwe, Dr. jur. Dipl.-Ing. M.Sc. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Hosenthien & Fuhlendorf Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118380.4 | 29.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | US19900605955 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: US 605955 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483741 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483741 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, H01L39/22 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H10N60/805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Squid mit Polymer-Isolation | [1992/19] | English: | SQUID utilizing polymeric insulation | [1992/19] | French: | Squid utilisant une isolation polymérique | [1992/19] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/44] | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1064275 ; | [A]EP0301962 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]EP0341502 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [AP]EP0428357 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |