EP0484799 - Door latch system for EMI shielded room [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CURRAN COMPANY 400 High Grove Boulevard Glendale Heights Illinois 60139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states THE CURRAN COMPANY 400 High Grove Boulevard Glendale Heights, Illinois 60139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curran, William E. 6N 312 Glendale Medinah, Illinois 60157 / US | 02 /
Weibler, Joseph C. 29 W. 170 Donald Avenue West Chicago, Illinois 60185 / US | 03 /
Egan, Michael T. 218 Traver Street Glen Ellyn, Illinois 60137 / US | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Robert, et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Bauer, Robert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118413.3 | 29.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | US19900605675 | 30.10.1990 Original published format: US 605675 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484799 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05C19/04 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
H05K9/0001 (EP);
E05C19/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1992/20] | Title | German: | Türverriegelungssystem für gegen elektromagnetische Interferenz abgeschirmten Kammer | [1992/20] | English: | Door latch system for EMI shielded room | [1992/20] | French: | Système de verrouillage de porte de chambre blindée contre les interférences électromagnétiques | [1992/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/02] | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3247312 ; | [YD]US4786758 ; | [Y]US3031220 ; | [A]US2184879 ; | [A]DE3916836 |