EP0487915 - Angled rotor head for centrifuges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Andreas Hettich Postfach 260 D-78503 Tuttlingen / DE | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eberle, Günter Gartenstrasse 100 D-7200 Tuttlingen / DE | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118465.3 | 30.10.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | DE19900016288U | 30.11.1990 Original published format: DE 9016288 U | [1992/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487915 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487915 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
B04B5/0414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/23] | Title | German: | Winkelkopf für Zentrifugen | [1992/23] | English: | Angled rotor head for centrifuges | [1992/23] | French: | Tête de rotor sous forme de cône pour centrifugeuses | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 31.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 08.07.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3343846 (HERAEUS CHRIST GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3601789 (EPPENDORF GERAETEBAU NETHELER); | [A]FR2156519 (IMMUNO AG); | [A]FR2270945 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]); | [A]DE3334655 (HERAEUS CHRIST GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4484906 (STRAIN DAVID H [US]); | [A]US4221325 (KUBOTA TOKIHITO) |