EP0510252 - Coaxial isolation mounting of a toroidal transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dailey, George E. 7208 Old Dominion Drive McLean, VA 22101 / US | 02 /
Hatton, Thomas E. 10331 Lee Manor Drive Manassas, VA 22110 / US | 03 /
Mock, Rene D. 12463 Orchard Street Mine Run, VA 22568 / US | 04 /
Volles, Frederick O. 10614 Brentwood Drive Manassas, VA 22111 / US | [1992/44] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/14] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Ott, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Klocke, Dipl.-Phys. Hans-J. Neubauer, Kappelstrasse 8 D-72160 Horb / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1992/44] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118611.2 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/44] | Priority number, date | US19910691937 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: US 691937 | [1992/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510252 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510252 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/33, H01F27/06 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
H01F30/16 (EP,US);
H01F27/06 (EP,US);
H01F27/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/44] | Title | German: | Koaxiale schwingungsdämpfende Anordnung eines Ringkerntransformators. | [1995/23] | English: | Coaxial isolation mounting of a toroidal transformer | [1992/44] | French: | Montage coaxial pour l'isolation des vibrations d'un transformateur toroidal | [1992/44] |
Former [1992/44] | Koaxiale schwingungsdämpfende Anordnung eines Röntgentransformators | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56105613 ; | [A]JP1291412 ; | [Y]DE3047603 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE3613861 (NKL NATURENERGIE UND KLEINSPAN [DE]); | [Y]DE3340985 (KAZUBEK KURT); | [A]DE2115574 (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH); | [A]DE9013582U ; | [A]WO9014674 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 179 (E-82)(851) 17 November 1981 & JP-A-56 105 613 ( TOKYO DENKI ), & JP56105613 A 19811117 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 73 (E-887)(4016) 9 February 1990 & JP-A-1 291 412 ( FUJI ELECTRIC CO ), & JP1291412 A 19900209 | Examination | JP56105613 | JP1291412 | - & JP-A-56 105 613 (TOKYO DENKI), & JP56105613 A 00000000 | - & JP-A-1 291 412, & JP1291412 A 00000000 |