EP0483848 - Vehicle installed fragrance supplying apparatus and deodorant accommodating vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishino, Tomohide Pakuhaitsu-Meijo, 9-10, Yanagihara 2-chome Kita-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Fukuta, Toshiaki 1-3-19, Seimeiyama, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Sassa, Yukiya 8-8, Meiko 2-chome, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 04 /
Okamoto, Kunio 40, Aza Sotoura, Taki-machi Okazaki-shi, Aichi / JP | 05 /
Akado, Hajime 9-22, Shojisaku, Izumi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/19] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118618.7 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900298105 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: JP 29810590 | JP19910004689 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: JP 468991 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483848 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483848 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483848 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/00 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B60H3/0007 (EP);
B60H3/0035 (EP);
B60H2003/0064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/19] | Title | German: | Riechstoffversorgungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeug und Deodorantbehälter | [1992/19] | English: | Vehicle installed fragrance supplying apparatus and deodorant accommodating vessel | [1992/19] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de parfum installé dans une voiture et récipient pour le déodorant | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02060821 ; | [A]US4913034 ; | [A]US4677902 ; | [A]DE9003654U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 231 (M-974)(4174) 16 May 1990 & JP-A-02 060 821 ( NIPPON DENSO ) 1 March 1990, & JP02060821 A 19900301 |