EP0494350 - Process and installation for the synthesis of methanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 D-44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bähnisch, Hans-Joachim Wembersweg 30 W-4600 Dortmund 76 / DE | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Postfach 10 46 45 D-44046 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118709.4 | 02.11.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | DE19914100632 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4100632 | [1992/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494350 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494350 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C31/04, C07C29/152, C07C29/151 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
C07C29/1516 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/1516, C07C31/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/29] | C07C31/04, C07C29/152 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Methanolsynthese | [1992/29] | English: | Process and installation for the synthesis of methanol | [1992/29] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la synthèse de méthanol | [1992/29] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3518362 ; | [A]US4772634 ; | [AD]US2904575 |