Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0541829 | Global Dossier | 11.01.1995 | B1 | EP0541829 | 19.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91118749 | 04.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4202680 | 06.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP91118749 | 04.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59104264D1 | 23.02.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP91118749 | 04.11.1991 |