EP0540774 - Fluid atomizing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL RITZAU PARI-WERK GmbH Moosstrasse 9 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states PAUL RITZAU PARI-WERK GmbH Moosstrasse 9 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoch, Martin, Dr.Ing. Etztalstrasse 21 W-8137 Berg / DE | 02 /
Lintl, Andreas Ludwig Thoma Weg 6 W-8130 Starnberg / DE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118993.4 | 07.11.1991 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540774 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540774 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00, A61M11/06 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
A61M11/06 (EP,US);
B05B7/0012 (EP,US);
B05B7/2435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitszerstäubervorrichtung | [1993/19] | English: | Fluid atomizing device | [1993/19] | French: | Dispositif de pulvérisation de liquide | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2023023 (EASTFIELD CORP); | [A]DE8437274U ; | [A]EP0171726 (BRUGGER INGE); | [A]DE8614551U ; | [A]DE8905364U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 293 (C-615)6. Juli 1989 | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 293 (C-615)6. Juli 1989 & JP-1 086 982 |