EP0484980 - Method of coating and apparatus thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chinda, Kuniyasu, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119094.0 | 08.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | JP19900302481 | 09.11.1990 Original published format: JP 30248190 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484980 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484980 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484980 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/74, B05C5/02 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
B05C5/0254 (EP);
G03C1/74 (EP);
G03C2001/7459 (EP);
G03C2001/7466 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/20] | G03C1/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1992/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung und Beschichtungsapparat dazu | [1992/20] | English: | Method of coating and apparatus thereby | [1992/20] | French: | Méthode d'enduction et appareil | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.03.1997 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2944393 ; | [Y]DE4008526 ; | [A]CH530032 ; | [A]US4623501 ; | [AP]EP0435351 ; | [AP]GB2234457 ; | [AP]US5004628 |