EP0485935 - Signal processing circuit for the european digital cellular radio-telephone system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL MOBILE COMMUNICATION FRANCE 15, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states ALCATEL MOBILE COMMUNICATION FRANCE 15, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE 10, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rousseau, Emmanuel 22, rue Jean Mermoz F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Dartois, Luc 98, avenue Paul Denis Huet F-78955 Carrieres sous Poissy / FR | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119196.3 | 11.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | FR19900014211 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9014211 | [1992/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485935 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485935 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04B1/40 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
G10L19/012 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/21] | H04Q7/04, H04B1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Signalverarbeitungseinheit für das europäische digitale zellulare Funktelefonsystem | [1992/21] | English: | Signal processing circuit for the european digital cellular radio-telephone system | [1992/21] | French: | Circuit de traitement du signal pour le système de radiotéléphone cellulaire numérique européen | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 31.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD] - ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION vol. 63, no. 4, 1989, ROMFORD (GB) pages 409 - 414; M. RAHIER ET AL: 'Advanced LSI Components for Digital Cellular Mobile Radio' | [YD] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS vol. 2, 1988, ESPOO (FI) pages 1803 - 1810; E. KUISMA ET AL: 'Signal Processing Requirements in Pan-European Digital Mobile Communications' | [A] - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING vol. 62, no. 763, Juillet 1990, WOOLWICH (GB) pages 16 - 17; 'ASIC family provides mobile radio functions' | [A] - FUNKSCHAU vol. 62, no. 12, Juin 1990, MüNCHEN (DE) pages 64 - 68; F. LEYRER: 'Mobile Kommunikation. Mega-Chips fürs Taschentelefon' |