EP0541841 - Method and apparatus for electrostatic imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christy, Orrin D. 786 Thomas Fax Drive West North Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Spence, Anne, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91119221.9 | 12.11.1991 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541841 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/385 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
B41J2/415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1993/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum elektrostatischen Bildaufbau | [1993/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for electrostatic imaging | [1993/20] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la formation d'images électrostatiques | [1993/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 23.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2645928 ; | [A]DE2515578 ; | [A]DE2148001 |