EP0485948 - Insulating device for containers or bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bröder, Hans Hopfenhorst 10 D-24232 Schönkirchen / DE | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/21] | Application number, filing date | 91119262.3 | 11.11.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | DE19900015541U | 09.11.1990 Original published format: DE 9015541 U | DE19910001044U | 30.01.1991 Original published format: DE 9101044 U | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0485948 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0485948 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47G23/04 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B65D81/3897 (EP);
B65D81/3886 (EP);
B65D2313/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | Isoliervorrichtung für Dosen oder Flaschen | [1992/21] | English: | Insulating device for containers or bottles | [1992/21] | French: | Dispositif isolant pour boîtes ou bouteilles | [1992/21] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 25.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4240271 ; | [Y]FR2398477 ; | [Y]US4882914 ; | [Y]US3905511 ; | [A]GB2221292 ; | [A]FR2597444 |