EP0487978 - Manufacturing method for pottery provided with flowing patterns or spreading patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi-Ken 479 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 6 Koiehonmachi 3-chome Tokoname-Shi Aichi-Ken 479 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibachi, Tomoaki 3-6 Koiehonmachi Tokoname-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Morishita, Mitsuo 3-6 Koiehonmachi Tokoname-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119375.3 | 13.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900338939 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33893990 | JP19910228147 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 22814791 | JP19910228148 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 22814891 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487978 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487978 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B28B23/00, B44F9/04, B28B3/00, B28B17/02 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
B28B17/026 (EP,US);
C04B33/00 (KR);
B28B1/005 (EP,US);
B28B23/0075 (EP,US);
B44F9/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Tonwaren mit Strömungsbilddekor oder Flammierung | [1992/23] | English: | Manufacturing method for pottery provided with flowing patterns or spreading patterns | [1992/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de poteries avec motifs en forme de chinure ou de couleurs étalées | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1931667 (LOETSCHER EMIL C); | [A]DE2114706 (KERAMISCHE IND BEDARFS KG PAUL); | [A]DE3813851 (DASAG DEUTSCHE NATURASPHALT GM [DE]); | [AP]EP0414149 (INAX CORP [JP]) |