EP0492121 - Process of treating sludge from paper production effluents and use of this sludge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wolters, Peter Roodborst 11 NL-7423 ED Deventer / NL | For all designated states Wolters, Gerrit Jan Droststraat 38 NL-8121 BJ Olst / NL | For all designated states Wolters, Jan Binnensingel 82 NL-7411 PP Deventer / NL | [1992/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119573.3 | 16.11.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | DE19904040818 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4040818 | DE19914108866 | 16.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108866 | [1992/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0492121 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0492121 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/00, C09D5/34, C09D7/12, C09J11/00, C04B18/04, // D21C5/00 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
D21C5/02 (EP);
C04B18/243 (EP);
C09D5/024 (EP);
C09D5/34 (EP);
C02F2103/28 (EP);
Y02W30/64 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/27] | D21C5/02, C02F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufbereitung von bei der Papierherstellung entstehendem Abwasser-Feststoffgemisch und Verwendung des Feststoffgemisches | [1992/27] | English: | Process of treating sludge from paper production effluents and use of this sludge | [1992/27] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement du mélange de solides des éffluents de la fabrication du papier et utilisation de ce mélange | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2462396 (MUENSTER L GRAF ZU HANDEL [DE]) | [X] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY. Bd. 57, Nr. 10, April 1987, APPLETON US Seite 1441; THOMAS, C. O. ET AL.: 'Waste paper fibers in cementitious composites' | [X] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY. Bd. 58, Nr. 7, Januar 1988, APPLETON US Seite 956; KOROL', P. V. ET AL.: 'Manufacture of fiberboards from waste-paper processing wastes.' | Examination | - Journal of Environment Engineering, Band 113, Nr. 1, Februar 1987, C.O. Thomas et al "Wastepaper Fibers in Cementitious Composites", Seiten 16-31. |