EP0495175 - Cyclohexane derivatives containing carboxyle groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Wolfgang, Dr. Föckerskamp 3 W-4270 Dorsten / DE | 02 /
Keil, Thomas, Dr. Siegerlandstrasse 27 W-4350 Recklinghausen / DE | [1992/30] | Application number, filing date | 91119601.2 | 16.11.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | DE19914101355 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101355 | [1992/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0495175 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0495175 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495175 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/608, C07C67/38 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
C07C69/608 (EP,US);
C07C67/38 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/38, C07C69/608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/30] | Title | German: | Carboxylgruppenhaltige Cyclohexanderivate | [1992/30] | English: | Cyclohexane derivatives containing carboxyle groups | [1992/30] | French: | Dérivés du cyclohexane contenant des groupes carboxyles | [1992/30] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.11.1995 | [1996/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB858257 (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH); | [A]FR1567495 ; | [A]EP0400292 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) |