EP0489298 - Endless V-belt or V-ribbed belt and transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moses, Reinhold Elisabethstrasse 4 W-3456 Eimen 1 / DE | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/03] |
Former [1996/02] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich R., Dipl.-Phys., et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119698.8 | 19.11.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | DE19904038465 | 03.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4038465 | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0489298 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0489298 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489298 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0489298 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/20 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
F16G5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | Endloser Keilriemen oder Keilrippenriemen und Antriebssystem | [1992/24] | English: | Endless V-belt or V-ribbed belt and transmission system | [1992/24] | French: | Courroie sans fin trapézoidale ou trapézoidale à nervures et système de transmission | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.1995
17.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Société Hutchinson 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.1995
17.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Société Hutchinson 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 23.08.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.04.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.09.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.09.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.09.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.11.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.11.1996 | Appeal received No. T0987/96 | 20.01.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.07.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.08.1998 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.10.1994 | NL | 12.10.1994 | AT | 19.11.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | SE | 12.01.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | NL | 12.10.1994 | |
AT | 19.11.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | NL | 12.10.1994 | |
AT | 19.11.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 12.10.1994 | |
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 12.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003724 ; | [A]US2792319 (FIHE JOHN L); | [AD]US3108484 (JACOB RABINOW); | [AD]EP0281432 (HUTCHINSON [FR]); | [AD]EP0285072 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]); | [A]US4790802 (ONOE SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0339249 (PIRELLI TRANSMISSIONI IND SPA [IT]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 14, Nr. 135 (M-949). 14. März 1990; & JP-A-2 003 724 (BANDO CHEM) 09-01-1990, & JP2003724 A 00000000 |