EP0548378 - Door or window fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRÜDER GOLDSCHMIDT BAUBESCHLÄGE GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Grubenstrasse 6 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER GOLDSCHMIDT BAUBESCHLÄGE GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Grubenstrasse 6 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldschmidt, Hans-Gerd In der Rose 24 W-5628 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Masch, Karl Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Masch, Karl Gerhard, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119788.7 | 19.11.1991 | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548378 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548378 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/08 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
E05B3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/26] | Title | German: | Fenster- oder Türbeschlag | [1993/26] | English: | Door or window fitting | [1993/26] | French: | Ferrure pour porte ou fenêtre | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1992 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 10.09.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2059319 (DE VRIES ABRAHAM); | [A]DE1113650 (HEINRICH WILKE); | [A]DE1553444 (DREXELIUS METALL FRANZ); | [X]DE2806417 (WILKE HEINRICH GMBH); | [A]DE3025553 (PRACHT GUENTHER) |