EP0487088 - Method for forming semiconductor crystal and semiconductor device formed by said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Hideshi, c/o CANON K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Tokunaga, Hiroyuki, c/o CANON K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119881.0 | 21.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | JP19900319511 | 22.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31951190 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0487088 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0487088 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/36, H01L33/00 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
H01L33/0066 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02538 (EP,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Halbleiterkristalls und dabei hergestellte Halbleiteranordnung | [1992/22] | English: | Method for forming semiconductor crystal and semiconductor device formed by said method | [1992/22] | French: | Méthode pour former un cristal semi-conducteur et composant semi-conducteur produit par ladite méthode | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 13.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/32] | 02.08.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.04.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/32] | Appeal following examination | 09.10.1996 | Appeal received No. T1120/96 | 11.12.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.04.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 23.04.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3411051 (KILBY JACK S); | [X]EP0276959 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]EP0281335 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0285358 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]EP0312401 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) |