EP0490143 - Method and apparatus for tipping sutures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORPORATION 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proto, George R. 31 Hillcrest Avenue West Haven, CT 06516 / US | 02 /
Colligan, Francis D. 30 Trushwood Place Waterbury, CT 06708 / US | 03 /
Bellmore, Harold J., Jr. 111 Baker Street West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119956.0 | 22.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900626995 | 13.12.1990 Original published format: US 626995 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490143 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490143 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490143 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/06, A61L17/00, B65H71/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/06195 (EP,US);
A61B17/06004 (EP,US);
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/06028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/25] | A61B17/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Nähfadenenden | [1992/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for tipping sutures | [1992/25] | French: | Méthode et appareillage pour traiter les extrémités de fils de sutures | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.01.1996 | CH | 31.01.1996 | LI | 31.01.1996 | NL | 31.01.1996 | SE | 30.04.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/28] | BE | 31.01.1996 | |
CH | 31.01.1996 | ||
LI | 31.01.1996 | ||
SE | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | BE | 31.01.1996 | |
SE | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/38] | SE | 30.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | GB835745 [ ] (ETHICON INC); | US3394704 [ ] (DERY EDMUND E); | GB2036812 [ ] (RUMP JOH MORITZ); | GB2071678 [ ] (VNII ISPYTATEL MED TECH); | EP0170608 [ ] (PRINT LOCK CORP [US]) | Examination | FR1579776 | US3667472 | US3999970 | BE879582 | GB2142945 | EP0331503 | EP0420410 | EP0428253 |