EP0489327 - Chroman derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gericke, Rolf, Dr. Mozartstrasse 19 W-6104 Seeheim / DE | 02 /
Baumgarth, Manfred, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 53 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Lues, Ingeborg, Dr. Katharinenstrasse 2 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Harting, Jürgen, Dr. Rodinghweg 15 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Bergmann, Rolf, Dr. Birkenhag 36 W-6101 Reichelsheim / DE | [1992/24] | Application number, filing date | 91120050.9 | 25.11.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | DE19904038752 | 05.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4038752 | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489327 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489327 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, A61K31/395 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | Chromanderivate | [1992/24] | English: | Chroman derivatives | [1992/24] | French: | Dérivés de chromanne | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 21.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2204868 (SANDOZ LTD); | [X]EP0363883 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) |