EP0488112 - Method of forming thin film of amorphous silicon by plasma CVD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube City Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-city Yamaguchi-pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states AGENCY OF INDUSTRIAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY 3-1, 1-chome, Kasumigaseki Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Akihisa 1-1-4, Umezono Tsukuba City, Ibaraki Pref. / JP | 02 /
Mashima, Satoshi 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka City, Mie Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Toda, Makoto 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka City, Mie Prefecture / JP | 04 /
Fujita, Kouji 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka City, Mie Prefecture / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/23] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120065.7 | 25.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900334180 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33418090 | JP19910095954 | 26.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9595491 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488112 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488112 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/24, C23C16/50 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C23C16/505 (EP,US);
C23C16/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bilden einer amorphen Siliziumdünnschicht mittels Plasma-CVD | [1992/23] | English: | Method of forming thin film of amorphous silicon by plasma CVD | [1992/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une couche mince de silicium amorphe, par dépôt chimique en phase vapeur assisté par un plasma | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62007859 ; | [YD]JP1294866 ; | [X]US4492736 (TANNER DAVID P [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 185 (C-428)(2632) 13 June 1987 & JP-A-62 007 859 ( HITACHI LTD ) 14 January 1987, & JP62007859 A 19870114 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 77 (C-688)(4020) 14 February 1990 & JP-A-1 294 866 ( SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 28 November 1989, & JP1294866 A 19891128 | [Y] - THIN SOLID FILMS vol. 174, no. 1, 1 July 1989, LAUSANNE CH pages 193 - 202; J.P.M. SCHMITT: 'Amorphous silicon deposition: industrial and technical challenges' |