EP0488132 - Electron source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitao, Satoshi 15, Karahashihiragaki-cho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 601 / JP | 02 /
Nonomura, Kinzo 3-1-5, Mayumi Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken 630-01 / JP | 03 /
Hashiguchi, Jumpei 30-4-608, Miiminamimachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu 572 / JP | 04 /
Murai, Ryuichi 6-3-304, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka-fu 576 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120091.3 | 26.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900333961 | 29.11.1990 Original published format: JP 33396190 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488132 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/04 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
H01J31/126 (EP,US);
H01J1/20 (KR);
H01J29/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/23] | Title | German: | Elektronenquelle | [1992/23] | English: | Electron source | [1992/23] | French: | Source d'électrons | [1992/23] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 26.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/27] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60112230 ; | [A]EP0391139 (NOKIA UNTERHALTUNGSELEKTRONIK [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 266 (E-352)(1989) 23 October 1985 & JP-A-60 112 230 ( MATSUSHITA ) 18 June 1985, & JP60112230 A 19850618 |