EP0494367 - Dough dividing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states Werner & Pfleiderer GmbH Theodorstrasse 10 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Judex, Helmut Hofpfad 27 W-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1992/29] | Application number, filing date | 91120107.7 | 26.11.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | DE19914100243 | 07.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4100243 | [1992/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494367 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494367 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A21C5/02 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
A21C5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/29] | Title | German: | Teigteilmaschine | [1992/29] | English: | Dough dividing machine | [1992/29] | French: | Machine à diviser la pâte | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.11.1995 | [2004/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1502504 (MACHF W VAN DIJK NV); | [AD]DE3530724 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) |