EP0488144 - Benzodioxole derivatives and hepatopathy improvers comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUMURA & CO. 4-10, 3-chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states TSUMURA & CO. 4-10, 3-chome, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Masayuki c/o Tsumura & Co., 3586, Yoshiwara, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-11 / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Shouichi c/o Tsumura & Co., 3586, Yoshiwara, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-11 / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Shigefumi c/o Tsumura & Co., 3586, Yoshiwara, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-11 / JP | 04 /
Hosaka, Kunio c/o Tsumura & Co., 3586, Yoshiwara, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken 300-11 / JP | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120148.1 | 26.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | JP19900324403 | 26.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32440390 | JP19900329486 | 30.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32948690 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488144 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/06, C07D409/12, C07D317/66, C07D317/60, A61K31/36, A61K31/385 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (KR);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D317/66 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | Benzodioxolderivate und Verbesserer von Leberkrankheiten, die sie enthalten | [1992/23] | English: | Benzodioxole derivatives and hepatopathy improvers comprising the same | [1992/23] | French: | Dérivés de benzodioxole et agents améliorant l'hépatopathie qui les contiennent | [1992/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/16] | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63185926 ; | [X]US3637687 (CHOW ALFRED W); | [X]US3761482 (NAKAGOME T, et al); | [X]GB1336913 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]GB1341401 (SANDOZ LTD); | [X]GB1401806 (SANDOZ LTD); | [X]US3914428 (WILBUR ROBERT DANIEL, et al); | [X]EP0052887 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]EP0123386 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4668799 (YOSHIZAWA JUNJI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0277091 (SCHERING AG [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 467 (C-550)(3314) 7 December 1988 & JP-A-63 185 926 ( SHIN NIPPON YAUHIN ), & JP63185926 A 19881207 | [X] - LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, vol. 689, 1965, Weinheim, DE, pages 163 - 170; F. DALLACKER ET AL.: 'Reaktionen der Schwefelund Selanabkömmlinge des Methylendioxybenzols' |