EP0498946 - Electric power assistance steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.04.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlagmueller, Walter Frankenstrasse 39 W-7141 Schwieberdingen / DE | [1992/34] | Application number, filing date | 91120238.0 | 27.11.1991 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | DE19914104048 | 09.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4104048 | [1992/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498946 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
B62D5/0409 (EP);
B62D5/0439 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/34] | Title | German: | Elektromotorische Servolenkung | [1992/34] | English: | Electric power assistance steering system | [1992/34] | French: | Direction assistée à moteur électrique | [1992/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 27.01.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/24] | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2492558 ; | [A]FR2642496 ; | [A]GB2228461 |