EP0532796 - Multifunctional document processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OKI AMERICA, INC. 3 University Plaza Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | [1993/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Darwin 761 Harry Road San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
Kano, Keisaku 127 Cotton Wood Drive Marlton, NJ 08053 / US | 03 /
Ring, John Joseph 965 Chanticleer Mews Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120778.5 | 03.12.1991 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | US19910746831 | 19.08.1991 Original published format: US 746831 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532796 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532796 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
H04N1/00238 (EP,US);
G06F40/10 (EP,US);
G06F40/12 (EP,US);
G06F40/151 (EP,US);
G06F40/174 (EP,US);
H04N1/00206 (EP,US);
H04N1/00236 (EP,US);
H04N1/00241 (EP,US);
H04N1/32496 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0081 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/12] | Title | German: | Multifunktionelles Dokumentenverarbeitungssystem | [1993/12] | English: | Multifunctional document processing system | [1993/12] | French: | Système multifonctionnel pour traitement de documents | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 31.07.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.10.1997 | Appeal received No. T0030/98 | 25.11.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.11.1999 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1999/45] | 09.03.2000 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2000/11] | 15.09.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 05.10.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2001 | BE | 13.06.2001 | CH | 13.06.2001 | GR | 13.06.2001 | IT | 13.06.2001 | LI | 13.06.2001 | NL | 13.06.2001 | DK | 13.09.2001 | SE | 13.09.2001 | LU | 03.12.2001 | ES | 20.12.2001 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
GR | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
LU | 03.12.2001 | ||
ES | 20.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
GR | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
ES | 20.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
ES | 20.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 13.06.2001 | ||
CH | 13.06.2001 | ||
LI | 13.06.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 13.06.2001 | |
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 13.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0262603 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]GB2217261 (KENTEK INFORMATION SYSTEM [US]); | [A]US4947345 (PARADISE ELIZABETH M [US], et al); | [X]EP0426412 (CANON KK [JP]) |