EP0490263 - Alpha-oxoacetamide derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue P.O. Box 10850 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue P.O. Box 10850 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Robin D. 2025 Columbia Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Eglen, Richard M. 2091 Sunnyview Lane Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Muchowski, Joseph M. 1720 Banff Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
Smith, William L. 1169 Sesame Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 05 /
Weinhardt, Klaus K. 155 Jackson San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120856.9 | 04.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | US19900624028 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: US 624028 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490263 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D453/02, C07D451/14, C07D451/02, C07D451/04, C07D471/08, C07D401/12, A61K31/435, A61K31/445, A61K31/46, // (C07D471/08, 221:00, 221:00) | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C07D451/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D451/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | Alpha-Oxoacetamid-Derivate | [1992/25] | English: | Alpha-oxoacetamide derivatives | [1992/25] | French: | Dérivés d'alpha-oxoacétamides | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 01.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/52] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0214772 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0247266 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0309423 (ANGELI INST SPA [IT]) |