EP0490264 - Channel type inductor with outer metallic casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nacke, Bernard, Dr. Wehrenboldstrasse 26 W-4670 Lünen / DE | 02 /
Mauve, Hans Werner Am Nierhof 16 W-4670 Lünen / DE | 03 /
Idziok, Karl-Heinz Nordseestrasse 142 W-4350 recklinghausen / DE | 04 /
Wicker, Helmut Rehbergstrasse 38 W-5840 Herdecke / DE | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91120869.2 | 05.12.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | DE19904039427 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039427 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490264 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/20 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
H05B6/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Rinneninduktor mit äusserem metallenen Gehäuse | [1992/25] | English: | Channel type inductor with outer metallic casing | [1992/25] | French: | Inducteur à chenal avec enveloppe extérieure métallique | [1992/25] | File destroyed: | 14.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/33] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3363044 ; | [A]GB792322 ; | [A]DE2029420 ; | [A]DE2208876 ; | [A]US4101726 |