EP0491239 - Process for the preparation of aldehydes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1996 [1996/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Wolfgang, Prof. Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Gartenstrasse 69 W-8050 Freising / DE | 02 /
Kohlpaintner, Christian, Dipl.-Chem. Kuglmoosstrasse 40 W-8209 Stephanskirchen / DE | 03 /
Bahrmann, Helmut, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Rostrasse 48 W-4236 Hamminkeln / DE | [1992/26] | Application number, filing date | 91120870.0 | 05.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | DE19904040315 | 17.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4040315 | [1992/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0491239 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0491239 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491239 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/50, B01J31/24 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
C07C47/00 (KR);
B01J31/24 (EP,US);
B01J31/2414 (EP,US);
B01J31/2452 (EP,US);
C07C45/50 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aldehyden | [1992/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of aldehydes | [1992/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'aldéhydes | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0133127 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]); | [Y]EP0279018 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [Y]EP0375573 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |