EP0494389 - Corrosion resistant magnesium titanate coatings for gas turbines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lau, Sai Kwing 21 Oakcliff Court E. Amherst, New York 14051 / US | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121198.5 | 10.12.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | US19910637913 | 07.01.1991 Original published format: US 637913 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494389 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, F01D5/28 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C23C4/10 (KR);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/1259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12618 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1992/29] | Title | German: | Korrosionsfeste Magnesiumtitanatbeschichtungen für Gasturbinen | [1992/29] | English: | Corrosion resistant magnesium titanate coatings for gas turbines | [1992/29] | French: | Revêtements en titanate de magnésium résistant à la corrosion pour turbines à gaz | [1992/29] | File destroyed: | 22.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/41] | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2323656 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [Y]FR1165190 (ARMOUR RES FOUND); | [A]GB2101910 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US3397080 (GIRARD ROLAND T, et al) | [A] - MATERIALS LETTERS vol. 3, no. 9, July 1985, AMSTERDAMNL pages 396 - 400; R. SIVAKUMAR: 'PHASE STABILITY AND THERMAL SHOCK RESISTANCE OF PLASMA SPRAYED MGO.ZRO2 COATINGS' | [A] - HIGH TEMPERATURE TECHNOLOGY vol. 7, no. 2, May 1989, GUILDFORDGB pages 73 - 81; T.N. RHYS-JONES ET AL: 'THERMAL BARRIER COATINGS FOR TURBINE APPLICATIONS IN AERO ENGINES' |