EP0516884 - Extraction system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-18, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1992/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koga, Koji 4536-4, Ooasi, Fukiage-machi Kitaadachi-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hiroshi 11-34, Midori-chyou, Gyouda-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Gonda, Yutaka 826-21, Ishiwara, Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/50] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121490.6 | 14.12.1991 | [1992/50] | Priority number, date | JP19910129965 | 31.05.1991 Original published format: JP 12996591 | [1992/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0516884 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0516884 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0516884 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/30 | [1992/50] | CPC: |
A47J31/30 (EP);
A47J31/00 (KR);
A47J31/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/50] | Title | German: | Extraktionsanlage | [1992/50] | English: | Extraction system | [1992/50] | French: | Système d'extraction | [1992/50] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.08.1995 | DE | 17.11.1995 | GB | 14.12.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1997/14] | DE | 17.11.1995 | |
GB | 14.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | DE | 17.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0217211 (ESSEGIELLE SRL [IT]); | [A]FR2558052 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE2952556 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) |