EP0495211 - Combined machine for processing products for making ice-cream and confectionery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carpigiani S.r.L. 45, Via Emilia I-40011 Anzola Emilia, Bologna / IT | [1992/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cocchi, Gino 30, Via Molinelli I-40137 Bologna / IT | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Porsia, Attilio, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber-Dr. Porsia Via Caffaro 3 16124 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Porsia, Attilio, et al c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber-Dr. Porsia Via Caffaro 3 I-16124 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 91121518.4 | 01.01.1992 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | IT1891 | 16.01.1991 Original published format: IT 1891 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495211 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495211 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/30, A23G9/22, A23G9/12, A23G9/08 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
A23G9/086 (EP,US);
A23G9/12 (EP,US);
A23G9/224 (EP,US);
A23G9/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/30] | Title | German: | Kombinierte Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Speiseeis und Konfekt | [1992/30] | English: | Combined machine for processing products for making ice-cream and confectionery | [1992/30] | French: | Machine combinée pour la mise en oeuvre de crème-glacée et confiserie | [1992/30] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/41: (deleted) | EPB 1992/30: Priority 160191 IT GE91A000018 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.1995 | BE | 21.06.1995 | MC | 21.06.1995 | PT | 21.09.1995 | SE | 21.09.1995 | LU | 31.01.1996 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
PT | 21.09.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
MC | 01.01.1996 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2001/24] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
MC | 21.06.1995 | ||
PT | 21.09.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
PT | 21.09.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.01.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
PT | 21.09.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 21.06.1995 | |
SE | 21.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE519115 ; | [A]US2004446 (MILLS HERBERT S); | [A]US2006299 (KAESTNER ROBERT E); | [A]GB513417 (JOSEPH CLEVELAND WILLIAMS, et al); | [A]US2233975 (EPPERSON CARL E); | [A]FR978237 ; | [A]FR2345088 (CLOIX HUBERT [FR]); | [A]US4364666 (KEYES RICHARD M); | [A]FR2542578 (OTT ERWIN AG [CH]); | [A]EP0123789 (CARPIGIANI BRUTO MACH [IT]); | [X]FR2558688 (AUTOFRIGOR STE FSE [FR]); | [A]US4583863 (PANDOLFI ALBERTO [IT]) |