EP0491329 - Process for the preparation of piperazinyl-pyrimidin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LONZA AG Gampel/Wallis Münchenerstrasse 38 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1992/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuo, David L., Dr. Bielastrasse 51 Brig (Kanton Wallis) / CH | 02 /
Voeffray, Robert, Dr. Chem. Florastrasse 37 Basel / CH | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Weinhold, Peter, et al Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Weinhold, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121548.1 | 16.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | CH19900004015 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: CH 401590 | CH19910000639 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: CH 63991 | [1992/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491329 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Piperazinylpyrimidin-Derivaten | [1992/26] | English: | Process for the preparation of piperazinyl-pyrimidin derivatives | [1992/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de pipérazinyl-pyrimidine | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/29] | 21.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0129128 (TROPONWERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |