EP0492498 - Ski containing flat strips or layers of fiber reinforced material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | For all designated states REITEX HYDRAULIK GMBH Postfach 1309 D-61453 Königstein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
For all designated states REITEX HYDRAULIK GMBH Postfach 1309 D-61453 Königstein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenz, Georg Michael Am Burgenblick 9 W-6240 Königstein/Ts. / DE | 02 /
Fester, Walter Dr. Peter-Konrad-Strasse 24 W-8424 Saal/Donau / DE | 03 /
Schuster, Ulrich Augsburger Strasse 101 W-8400 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Leicht, Erhard Dr. Kurhausstrasse 56 W-6238 Hofheim a.Ts. / DE | 05 /
Schäfer, Ralph Mecklenburger Strasse 55 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1992/27] | Application number, filing date | 91121934.3 | 20.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | DE19904041740 | 24.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4041740 | [1992/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0492498 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0492498 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/12 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
A63C5/12 (EP,US);
A63C5/126 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24074 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24091 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24107 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24124 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3382 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3569 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3577 (EP,US);
Y10T442/40 (EP,US);
Y10T442/475 (EP,US);
Y10T442/654 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | Ski enthaltend flächenförmige Platten oder Bänder aus einem faserverstärkten Werkstoff | [1992/27] | English: | Ski containing flat strips or layers of fiber reinforced material | [1992/27] | French: | Ski comprenant des bandes ou feuilles planes en matériau renforcé en fibres | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.12.1994 | DK | 21.12.1994 | GR | 21.12.1994 | NL | 21.12.1994 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 21.12.1994 | |
DK | 21.12.1994 | ||
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/49] | BE | 21.12.1994 | |
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 21.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2332129 (CHEMIE LINZ AG [AT]); | [X]US4556237 (MEATTO FRANKLIN D [US], et al); | [A]EP0235087 (ROHRMOSER ALOIS SKIFABRIK [AT]); | [A]FR2611346 (ISOVOLTA [AT]) |