EP0493762 - Equilibrator device for a gun, especially a big calibre gun with a long barrel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegmann & Co. GmbH August-Bode-Strasse 1 D-34127 Kassel / DE | [1994/40] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states WEGMANN & Co. GmbH August-Bode-Strasse 1 D-34127 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tripp, Ernst Frommershäuser Strasse 77 A W-3502 Vellmar / DE | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Feder, Wolf-Dietrich Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121939.2 | 20.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | DE19914100102 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4100102 | [1992/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493762 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493762 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493762 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F41A27/30 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
F41A27/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/28] | Title | German: | Unbalance-Ausgleichsvorrichtung für eine Waffe, insbesondere eine grosskalibrige Waffe mit langem Rohr | [1992/28] | English: | Equilibrator device for a gun, especially a big calibre gun with a long barrel | [1992/28] | French: | Equilibrateur pour une arme à feu, notamment une arme à feu de gros calibre équipée d'un long tube de canon | [1995/44] |
Former [1992/28] | Equilibrateur pour une arme à feu, notamment une arme à feu de gros calibre equipée d'un long tube de canon | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 27.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE618723 (KREISELGERAETE G M B H VORMALS); | [AD]DE1097319 (UHL SIEGFRIED); | [A]US3033085 (WITKIN DONALD E); | [A]FR2459466 (FRANCE ETAT); | [AD]DE3633375 (HONEYWELL REGELSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE3732745 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) |