Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04324340 | Global Dossier | 13.11.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU652700B | Global Dossier | 01.09.1994 | B2 | AU1029892 | 27.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0499714 | Global Dossier | 06.09.1995 | B1 | EP0499714 | 26.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2057610 | 16.11.1999 | C | CA2057610 | 23.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS51392 | 14.10.1992 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69112805T | 04.04.1996 | T2 | DE69112805D1 | 12.10.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2078420T | 16.12.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100224517B | 15.10.1999 | B1 | KR920016828 | 25.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9200740 | 01.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5182938 | 02.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US65984291 | 22.02.1991 |