EP0499714 - Method and apparatus for detecting bubbles in pressurized liquid dispensing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [1992/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkel, Stephen L. 380 Oakmoor Road Bay Village, Ohio 44140 / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91121959.0 | 20.12.1991 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | US19910659842 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: US 659842 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499714 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499714 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01P13/00, G01N11/08, G08B21/00 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G01N11/08 (EP,US);
G01L9/00 (KR);
G01P13/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung, um Blasen in einem Druckfördersystem für Flüssigkeiten zu entdecken | [1992/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting bubbles in pressurized liquid dispensing systems | [1992/35] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour détecter des bulles dans un système distributeur de liquide sous pression | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/44] | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4662540 (SCHROTER DAMON C [US]); | [Y]US3863244 (LICHTBLAU GEORGE JAY); | [A]EP0163069 (ASEA GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE8607540U |