EP0494446 - Electric isolated antifriction bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF GmbH Postfach 14 40, Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 D-97419 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states SKF GmbH Postfach 14 40, Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 D-97419 Schweinfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köttritsch, Hubert Ybbsstrasse 21 A-3300 Amstetten / DE | 02 /
Kure, Gottfried Roithnerstrasse 105 B A-4050 Traun / DE | [1992/29] | Application number, filing date | 91122188.5 | 23.12.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | DE19914100587 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4100587 | [1992/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494446 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494446 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/52, H02K5/173 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
H02K5/173 (EP);
F16C19/52 (EP);
F16C33/586 (EP);
F16C33/62 (EP);
H02K11/40 (EP);
F16C2202/30 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Elektrisch isoliertes Wälzlager | [1992/29] | English: | Electric isolated antifriction bearing | [1992/29] | French: | Palier à roulement isolé anti-énergie électrique | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 02.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8029066U ; | [A]DE3741678 (ROTTMERHUSEN HANS HERMANN [DE]); | [A]FR2626632 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]); | [AP]FR2653191 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE [FR]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRA- TED, EL section, week E 33, September 29, 1982 DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD., London | Examination | - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, EL section, week E 33, September 29, 1982, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, SU-875 514 (Kiev Civil Aviation) |