EP0495247 - Process for the perimetry of the visual field of the eye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interzeag AG Rietbachstrasse 5 CH-8952 Schlieren / CH | [1992/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weijland, Albert Im Rigiblick 3 a CH-8621 Wetzikon / CH | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1997/14] | Groner, Manfred, Dr., et al Dr. P. Fillinger Patentanwalt AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1996/36] | Fillinger, Peter, Dr., et al Dr. P. Fillinger Patentanwalt AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1992/30] | Fillinger, Peter, Dr. Rütistrasse 1a, Postfach 358 CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 91122238.8 | 27.12.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | CH19910000140 | 18.01.1991 Original published format: CH 14091 | [1992/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495247 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495247 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/024 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
A61B3/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Perimetrieren des Gesichtsfeldes eines Auges | [1992/30] | English: | Process for the perimetry of the visual field of the eye | [1992/30] | French: | Procédé de périmétrie du champ visuel de l'oeil | [1992/30] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.09.1996 | IT | 04.09.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.09.1996 | |
FR | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/32] | FR | 31.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4012128 (REGAN DAVID); | [YD]EP0363610 (INTERZEAG AG [CH]); | [A]US4083365 (YANCEY DON ROBERT); | [A]EP0320767 (WEBER JORG DR MED) | Examination | - Reim, Augenheilkunde, Stuttgart 1985, Seiten 108-111 |