EP0493801 - Bi-level card edge connector with selectively movable contacts for use with different types of cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS USA INC. 51 Richards Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states FRAMATOME CONNECTORS USA INC. Richards Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states Burndy Corporation Richards Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noschese, Rocco J. 35 Wilton Woods Wilton, CT / US | 02 /
Piorunneck, Heinz 10 Trailwood Lane Trumbull, CT / US | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/28] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122260.2 | 27.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | US19910637046 | 03.01.1991 Original published format: US 637046 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493801 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493801 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493801 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/70 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
H01R12/89 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/28] | H01R23/68, H01R23/70 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1996/49] |
Former [1992/28] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Leiterplatten-Randverbinder mit zwei Kontaktniveaus, mit beweglichen Kontakten selektiver Betätigung zum Gebrauch mit Karten verschiedener Typen | [1997/14] | English: | Bi-level card edge connector with selectively movable contacts for use with different types of cards | [1992/28] | French: | Connecteur à deux niveaux pour bordure de carte avec contacts mobiles sélectifs pour utilisation avec différentes sortes de cartes | [1992/28] |
Former [1992/28] | Zwei ebenen leiterplatten Randverbinder, mit beweglichen Kontakten selektiver Betätigung zum Gebrauch mit Karten verschiedener Typen | Examination procedure | 21.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9004272 (MCMURDO INSTR CO LTD [GB]); | [Y]US4613193 (BEERS HOWARD L [US]); | [A]US4298237 (GRIFFITH GARY L, et al) |