EP0497005 - Access method for optical local area network systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eda, Masahiro, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122290.9 | 27.12.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900416929 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41692990 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497005 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497005 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497005 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04J14/02, H04B10/00 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04L12/423 (EP,US);
H04J14/0201 (EP,US);
H04J14/021 (US);
H04J14/0212 (US);
H04J14/0283 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/32] | H04L12/28, H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/32] | Title | German: | Zugriffsverfahren für optische Nahbereichsnetz-Systeme | [1992/32] | English: | Access method for optical local area network systems | [1992/32] | French: | Procédé d'accès pour systèmes de réseaux locaux optiques | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0284293 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0294133 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0299749 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |