EP0493809 - A method of making a window glass with a synthetic resin frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuga, Kazuhiko 1150, Hanesawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshihara, Noriyuki 1150, Hanesawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Kazuhiro 1150, Hanesawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122301.4 | 27.12.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | JP19900416740 | 29.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41674090 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493809 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493809 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/00, B29C70/76, B29C67/00, B29C33/44 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B29C33/44 (EP);
B29C63/0034 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/4895 (EP);
B29C66/474 (EP);
B29C66/81455 (EP);
B29C66/81811 (EP);
B29C67/0044 (EP);
B29C70/763 (EP);
B60J10/70 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/81812 (EP);
B29K2709/08 (EP);
B29L2007/002 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2009/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2009/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/083 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/16 (EP); |
Former IPC [1992/28] | B29C63/00, B29C67/18, B29C67/00, B29C33/44 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fensterglas mit Kunststoffrahmen | [1992/28] | English: | A method of making a window glass with a synthetic resin frame | [1992/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une vitre avec cadre en matière plastique | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62251229 ; | [A]JP1045624 ; | [Y]EP0390151 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0368669 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]); | [A]FR2194560 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 126 (M-687)19 April 1988 & JP-A-62 251 229 ( TOKAI KOGYO KK ) 2 November 1987, & JP62251229 A 19871102 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 234 (M-832)(3582) 30 May 1989 & JP-A-1 045 624 ( ICHIKOH IND LTD ) 20 February 1989, & JP1045624 A 19890220 |